PA HB1493 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 12165, carrying Pennsylvania Route 150 over the Bald Eagle Creek, in Bald Eagle Township, Clinton County, as the Colonel Henry Bossert Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 12165, carrying Pennsylvania Route 150 over the Bald Eagle Creek, in Bald Eagle Township, Clinton County, as the Colonel Henry Bossert Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1493 PN 1623, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-09-29SenateIn the Senate
2021-09-29HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2021-09-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-09-28HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-09-28HouseSecond consideration
2021-09-27HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-15HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-08HouseRe-committed to RULES
2021-06-08HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-08HouseReported as committed
2021-05-26HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback