PA HB1490 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for definitions, for driver certification program and for budget and fees; providing for assessment notice and hearings; further providing for fund and for transfer of money from fund; providing for fees; further providing for special funds in cities of the first class, for power of authority to issue certificates of public convenience and for restrictions; and making an appropriation.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for driver certification program and for budget and fees; providing for assessment notice and hearings; further providing for fund and for transfer of money from fund; providing for fees; further providing for special funds in cities of the first class, for power of authority to issue certificates of public convenience and for restrictions; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - Senate - HB 1490 PN 2138, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 1490 PN 2138, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 1490 PN 2138, SUSP RULES, ROSS (Y: 189 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1490 PN 2016, 2013 A2323, ROSS (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 1490 PN 2138, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 1490 PN 2138, SUSP RULES, ROSS (Y: 189 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1490 PN 2016, 2013 A2323, ROSS (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act No. 64 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-12 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |