PA HB149 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in obstructing governmental operations, providing for unlawful use of an audio or video device in court.
Title
In obstructing governmental operations, providing for unlawful use of an audio or video device in court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 149 PN 4251, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 149 PN 4251, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 149 PN 113, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 149 PN 4251, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 149 PN 4251, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 149 PN 113, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 94 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (187-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-16 | House | In the House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-05-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-22 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-10 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-09 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |