PA HB1482 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, to grant and convey to Gettysburg Foundation, or its successors or assigns, certain land situate in Gettysburg Borough, Adams County; to grant and convey to the Scranton School District, or its successors or assigns, certain lands situate in the City of Scranton, Lackawanna County; to grant and convey to Redevelopment Authority of the City of Bethlehem, or its successors or assigns, certain land situate in the City of Bethlehem, Lehigh County; and to grant and convey to La Salle University, or its successors or assigns, certain land and improvements situate in the 17th Ward (formerly 49th Ward), City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County, known as the Ogontz Armory; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Transportation, to grant and convey to the City of Lock Haven certain lands situate in the City of Lock Haven, Clinton County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, at a price to be determined through a public solicitation for proposals, certain land, buildings and improvements situate in East Allen Township, Northampton County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to release restrictive covenants in the City of Hazleton, Luzerne County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, to grant and convey to Gettysburg Foundation, or its successors or assigns, certain land situate in Gettysburg Borough, Adams County; to grant and convey to the Scranton School District, or its successors or assigns, certain lands situate in the City of Scranton, Lackawanna County; to grant and convey to Redevelopment Authority of the City of Bethlehem, or its successors or assigns, certain land situate in the City of Bethlehem, Lehigh County; and to grant and convey to La Salle University, or its successors or assigns, certain land and improvements situate in the 17th Ward (formerly 49th Ward), City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County, known as the Ogontz Armory; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Transportation, to grant and convey to the City of Lock Haven certain lands situate in the City of Lock Haven, Clinton County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, at a price to be determined through a public solicitation for proposals, certain land, buildings and improvements situate in East Allen Township, Northampton County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to release restrictive covenants in the City of Hazleton, Luzerne County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - House - HB 1482 PN 2153, CONCUR (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - HB 1482 PN 2153, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - HB 1482 PN 2002, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - HB 1482 PN 2153, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - HB 1482 PN 2002, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | House | Act No. 63 |
2013-07-09 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2013-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (203-0) |
2013-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2013-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2013-06-29 | House | In the House |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-17 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-10 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |