PA HB1473 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the exclusion of veterans' benefit payments from income for Commonwealth programs.
Title
Providing for the exclusion of veterans' benefit payments from income for Commonwealth programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1473 PN 2074, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1473 PN 2074, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2016-10-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2016-10-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-17 | House | Second consideration |
2016-09-28 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-21 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-07-22 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |