PA HB1465 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of July 7, 1972 (P.L.743, No.176), known as the Lincoln University-Commonwealth Act, making an appropriation for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of the appropriation; and providing a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Title
A Supplement to the act of July 7, 1972 (P.L.743, No.176), known as the Lincoln University-Commonwealth Act, making an appropriation for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of the appropriation; and providing a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - House - HB 1465 PN 1906, 2013 A2393, SUSP RULES, MARKOSEK (Y: 87 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |