PA HB1452 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-19 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-19 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for junior hunter projects; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for a volunteer instructor license and further providing for license costs and fees and for unlawful acts concerning licenses.
Title
In Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for junior hunter projects; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for a volunteer instructor license and further providing for license costs and fees and for unlawful acts concerning licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1452 PN 2042, FP (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1452 PN 2042, FP (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2016-02-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (178-0) |
2016-02-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-02-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-09 | House | Second consideration |
2016-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-27 | House | First consideration |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-07-16 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |