PA HB1443 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of September 26, 1951 (P.L.1539, No.389), known as The Clinical Laboratory Act, providing for advertisements for laboratory tests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for advertisements for laboratory tests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1443 PN 1900, FP (Y: 170 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1443 PN 1900, 2021 A2769 (Y: 88 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1443 PN 1900, 2021 A2752 (Y: 88 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1443 PN 1900, 2021 A2749 (Y: 88 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01968 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-09SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2021-11-08SenateIn the Senate
2021-11-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (170-30)
2021-11-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-10-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-10-27HouseSecond consideration
2021-10-26HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-15HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-23HouseRe-committed to RULES
2021-06-23HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-23HouseReported as amended
2021-05-20HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1443
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1443&pn=1567
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1443&pn=1900
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1443P1900.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=753
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=754
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=560
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=561
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=562
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=568
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/08/2021&RollCallId=1024

Bill Comments

feedback