PA HB1440 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1440 PN 1951, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1440 PN 1951, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Act No. 159 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2013-06-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-18 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |