PA HB1424 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for Holocaust, genocide and human rights violations instruction.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for Holocaust, genocide and human rights violations instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - HB 1424 PN 1940, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1424 PN 1940, 2013 A2263, BOYLE, B. (Y: 99 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - HB 1424 PN 1940, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1424 PN 1940, 2013 A2263, BOYLE, B. (Y: 99 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Act No. 70 |
2014-06-26 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-16 | House | Signed in House |
2014-06-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2014-06-16 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-06-11 | House | In the House |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2013-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |