PA HB1420 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1200, No.202), known as the Solicitation of Funds for Charitable Purposes Act, further providing for registration of charitable organizations, financial reports, fees and failure to file.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for registration of charitable organizations, financial reports, fees and failure to file.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1420 PN 1784, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1420 PN 1784, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-22SenateAct No. 71
2017-12-22SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-13SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-13SenateSigned in Senate
2017-12-13SenateSigned in House
2017-12-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-12-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-12-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-11SenateSecond consideration
2017-12-11SenateRemoved from table
2017-10-25SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-09-19SenateFirst consideration
2017-09-19SenateReported as committed
2017-06-16SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-06-14SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-0)
2017-06-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-07HouseReported as committed
2017-05-19HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1420
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1420&pn=1784
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=496
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=623
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=494
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/14/2017&RollCallId=603
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=09/19/2017&RollCallId=438
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=586
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=372

Bill Comments

feedback