PA HB1367 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-13 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-13 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, further providing, in Local Government Capital Project Loan Fund provisions, for assistance to municipalities.
Title
Further providing, in Local Government Capital Project Loan Fund provisions, for assistance to municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-13 | Removed from table | |
2009-05-12 | Laid on the table | |
2009-05-12 | First consideration | |
2009-05-12 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-28 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |