PA HB1363 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 26, 2008 (P.L.1672, No.135), known as the Abandoned and Blighted Property Conservatorship Act, further providing for definitions, for initiation of action, for appointment of conservator, for powers and duties of conservator, for incurring indebtedness and for sale of property.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for initiation of action, for appointment of conservator, for powers and duties of conservator, for incurring indebtedness and for sale of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - HB 1363 PN 1962, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - HB 1363 PN 1761, 2013 A1928, MASSER (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - HB 1363 PN 1962, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - HB 1363 PN 1761, 2013 A1928, MASSER (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 157 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (192-0) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-07 | House | In the House |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2013-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |