PA HB1355 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 62-22)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 62-22)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating the westbound bridge carrying Interstate 90 over Six Mile Creek in Harborcreek Township, Erie County, as the Jarrid L. King Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the westbound bridge carrying Interstate 90 over Six Mile Creek in Harborcreek Township, Erie County, as the Jarrid L. King Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - HB 1355 PN 1584, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - HB 1355 PN 1584, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - HB 1355 PN 1584, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate | Act No. 19 |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2011-11-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2011-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2011-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-04-20 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |