PA HB1348 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in lobbying disclosure, further providing for registration, for reporting, for prohibited activities, for penalties and for registration fees, fund established, system and regulations.
Title
In lobbying disclosure, further providing for registration, for reporting, for prohibited activities, for penalties and for registration fees, fund established, system and regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2260, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2260, 2015 A3464, DALEY, M. (Y: 82 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2260, 2015 A3450, COHEN (Y: 81 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03436 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03436 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2260, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2260, 2015 A3464, DALEY, M. (Y: 82 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2260, 2015 A3450, COHEN (Y: 81 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03436 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03436 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-10-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2015-10-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-06 | House | Second consideration |
2015-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-30 | House | First consideration |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |