PA HB1346 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Passed on October 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Passed on October 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusion, defining the offense of unlawful use of unmanned aircraft; and, in preemptions, prohibiting local regulation of unmanned aircraft.
Title
In burglary and other criminal intrusion, defining the offense of unlawful use of unmanned aircraft; and, in preemptions, prohibiting local regulation of unmanned aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1346 PN 2167, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1346 PN 2167, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02375 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1346 PN 2167, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02375 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-12 | Senate | Act No. 78 |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-07-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2017-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |