PA HB1336 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, changing and adding provisions relating to selection of justices and judges.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, changing and adding provisions relating to selection of justices and judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03593 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03593 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03593 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03593 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-15 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-20 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-16 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |