PA HB1328 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 110 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 110 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 26, 1947 (P.L.318, No.140), known as the CPA Law, further providing for general powers of the board, for requirements for issuance of certificate, for peer review and for unlawful acts.
Title
Further providing for general powers of the board, for requirements for issuance of certificate, for peer review and for unlawful acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1328 PN 2641, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1328 PN 2641, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A03296 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1328 PN 2641, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A03296 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 110 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-10-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2022-02-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-07 | House | Second consideration |
2022-01-26 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |