PA HB1317 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-19)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of U.S. Route 15 over State Route 114, Mechanicsburg Borough, Cumberland County as the Corporal Jonathan Dean Faircloth Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of U.S. Route 15 over State Route 114, Mechanicsburg Borough, Cumberland County as the Corporal Jonathan Dean Faircloth Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1317 PN 1765, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1317 PN 1765, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-22 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-10-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-07 | House | Second consideration |
2015-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-05 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |