PA HB1287 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Warrior Run-Fort Freeland Heritage Society certain lands situate in Delaware Township, Northumberland County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Warrior Run-Fort Freeland Heritage Society certain lands situate in Delaware Township, Northumberland County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1287 PN 1562, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1287 PN 1562, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1287 PN 1562, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-30 | Senate | Act No. 47 |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-09-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-06 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |