PA HB1280 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 24, 2018 (P.L.719, No.112), known as the Patient Test Result Information Act, further providing for definitions, for test results and for duties of Department of Health.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for test results and for duties of Department of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1280 PN 2587, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1280 PN 1899, 2021 A3232 (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01963 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1280 PN 2587, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1280 PN 1899, 2021 A3232 (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01963 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2022-01-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2022-01-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-01-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to HEALTH |