PA HB126 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in prescribing opioids to minors, further providing for procedure; providing for reimbursement of patient expenses associated with participation in cancer clinical trials and for duties of the Department of Health; imposing a penalty; providing for the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by certain entities and organizations; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Health.
Title
In prescribing opioids to minors, further providing for procedure; providing for reimbursement of patient expenses associated with participation in cancer clinical trials and for duties of the Department of Health; imposing a penalty; providing for the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by certain entities and organizations; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 126 PN 4072, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A09192 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A09476 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 126 PN 4072, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 126 PN 3814, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 126 PN 92, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A09192 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A09476 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 126 PN 4072, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 126 PN 3814, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 126 PN 92, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 93 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (48-0) |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-09-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-09-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (195-0) |
2018-09-25 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2018-06-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-22 | House | In the House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-03-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-21 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HEALTH |