PA HB1246 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-08 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-18 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-23 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-11 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-09 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-08 | House | First consideration |
2015-12-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |