PA HB1244 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of U.S. Route 11 over the Susquehanna River between the City of Pittston and West Pittston Borough, Luzerne County, as the Specialist Dale J. Kridlo Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of U.S. Route 11 over the Susquehanna River between the City of Pittston and West Pittston Borough, Luzerne County, as the Specialist Dale J. Kridlo Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1244 PN 1488, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1244 PN 1488, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2017-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |