PA HB1237 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-1)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review and for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review; providing for regulations deemed withdrawn; further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission; and providing for concurrent resolution required for economically significant regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review and for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review; providing for regulations deemed withdrawn; further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission; and providing for concurrent resolution required for economically significant regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05683 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2018-02-06HouseLaid on the table
2018-02-06HouseFirst consideration
2018-02-06HouseReported as amended
2017-10-16HouseRe-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-10-16HouseReported with request to re-refer to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-04-17HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1237
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1237&pn=1464
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1237&pn=2996
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=972
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/06/2018&RollCallId=1254
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/06/2018&RollCallId=1255

Bill Comments

feedback