PA HB122 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.221, No.63), known as the Pennsylvania Drug and Alcohol Abuse Control Act, establishing the Project Lazarus Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Project Lazarus Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: HB 122 PN 2744, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 122 PN 351, 2017 A4819, CARROLL (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-08SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-12-05SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-12-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-11-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-11-21HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-11-20HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-21HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-08HouseReported as committed
2017-02-06HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=122
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0122&pn=0351
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0122&pn=2744
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/08/2017&RollCallId=333
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=855
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/04/2017&RollCallId=1100
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=877

Bill Comments

feedback