PA HB1219 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-13 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-13 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), know as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income and for special tax provisions for poverty and providing for alternative special tax provisions for poverty; in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions, for imposition of tax, for reports and payment of tax, for consolidated reports and for manufacturing innovation and reinvestment deduction; in realty transfer tax, further providing for transfer of tax; in tax credit and tax benefit administration, further providing for definitions; in entertainment production tax credit, further providing for definitions, for credit for qualified film production expenses, for carryover, carryback and assignment of credit and for limitations; in Pennsylvania Economic Development for a Growing Economy (PA EDGE) tax credits, providing for biotechnology; in neighborhood assistance tax credit, further providing for tax credit and for grant of tax credit; providing for expanded neighborhood improvement zones; in Pennsylvania Child and Dependent Care Enhancement Tax Credit Program, further providing for credit for child and dependent care employment-related expenses; providing for Public Transportation Trust Fund; and, in general provisions, further providing for underpayment of estimated tax, for method of filing and for allocation of tax credits.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income and for special tax provisions for poverty and providing for alternative special tax provisions for poverty; in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions, for imposition of tax, for reports and payment of tax, for consolidated reports and for manufacturing innovation and reinvestment deduction; in realty transfer tax, further providing for transfer of tax; in tax credit and tax benefit administration, further providing for definitions; in entertainment production tax credit, further providing for definitions, for credit for qualified film production expenses, for carryover, carryback and assignment of credit and for limitations; in Pennsylvania Economic Development for a Growing Economy (PA EDGE) tax credits, providing for biotechnology; in neighborhood assistance tax credit, further providing for tax credit and for grant of tax credit; providing for expanded neighborhood improvement zones; in Pennsylvania Child and Dependent Care Enhancement Tax Credit Program, further providing for credit for child and dependent care employment-related expenses; providing for Public Transportation Trust Fund; and, in general provisions, further providing for underpayment of estimated tax, for method of filing and for allocation of tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02359 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 2089, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 1694, 2023 A2153 (Y: 166 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 1694, 2023 A2152 (Y: 150 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01277 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 2089, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 1694, 2023 A2153 (Y: 166 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 1694, 2023 A2152 (Y: 150 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01277 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2023-10-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-10-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-101) |
2023-10-03 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2023-10-03 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2089 |
2023-10-03 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-02 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-10-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2023-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to FINANCE |