PA HB1219 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-16)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-16)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1012, known as the Diamondville Bridge, Cherryhill Township, Indiana County, as the Sgt. Robert Eugene Goodlin Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1012, known as the Diamondville Bridge, Cherryhill Township, Indiana County, as the Sgt. Robert Eugene Goodlin Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1219 PN 1447, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 1447, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 1447, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 18 |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2017-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |