PA HB1219 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 2845, FP (Y: 177 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 2764, 2015 A5837, SCHWEYER (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 2764, 2015 A5725, PEIFER (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05503 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05503 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 2845, FP (Y: 177 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 2764, 2015 A5837, SCHWEYER (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1219 PN 2764, 2015 A5725, PEIFER (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05503 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05503 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-02-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (177-0) |
2016-02-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-02-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-01-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-26 | House | First consideration |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |