PA HB1213 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in consolidated county assessment, further providing for short title and scope of chapter and for appeals by taxing districts and providing for standards of redress in appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In consolidated county assessment, further providing for short title and scope of chapter and for appeals by taxing districts and providing for standards of redress in appeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1213 PN 1486, 2017 A1409, BULLOCK (Y: 88 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1213 PN 1486, 2017 A1336, HARPER (Y: 109 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1213 PN 1486, 2017 A1927, NELSON (Y: 115 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1213 PN 1486, 2017 A2227, KAMPF (Y: 107 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1213 PN 1696, MOT REV PRIOR PR, KAMPF (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Commerce: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01122 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-19HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-19HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-23HouseMotion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 1486
2017-05-10HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as amended
2017-04-19HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1213
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1213&pn=1486
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1213&pn=1696
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=356
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=358
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=355
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=375
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=564
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=565
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=566
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=567

Bill Comments

feedback