PA HB121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 100 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 100 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the transfer of Project 70 restrictions from 0.043 acres of State Game Land 249 that will be purchased by the Department of Transportation for highway right-of-way to 0.043 acres of replacement game land that will be deeded over to the Pennsylvania Game Commission by the Department of Transportation; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the
Title
Authorizing the transfer of Project 70 restrictions from 0.043 acres of State Game Land 249 that will be purchased by the Department of Transportation for highway right-of-way to 0.043 acres of replacement game land that will be deeded over to the Pennsylvania Game Commission by the Department of Transportation; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: HB 121 PN 3560, CONCURRENCE (Y: 156 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 121 PN 3560, Final Passage-Reconsidered (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 121 PN 3560, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A05705 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 121 PN 89, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: HB 121 PN 3560, CONCURRENCE (Y: 156 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 121 PN 3560, Final Passage-Reconsidered (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 121 PN 3560, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A05705 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 121 PN 89, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | House | Act No. 100 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-24 | House | Signed in House |
2022-10-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (156-44) |
2022-10-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-10-24 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-10-19 | House | In the House |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Final passage (46-3) |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-committed to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-04-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-13 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |