PA HB1187 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in special licenses and permits, further providing for Lake Erie fishing permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In special licenses and permits, further providing for Lake Erie fishing permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1187 PN 1384, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2020-01-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-14HouseSecond consideration
2020-01-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-19HouseReported as committed
2019-04-11HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback