PA HB1182 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 19, 1931 (P.L.589, No.202), referred to as the Barbers' License Law, further providing for supervision of shops and schools and licenses and renewal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for supervision of shops and schools and licenses and renewal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1182 PN 1715, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1182 PN 1715, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A01426 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07SenateAct No. 76
2021-10-07SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-09-29SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-09-29SenateSigned in Senate
2021-09-29SenateSigned in House
2021-09-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2021-09-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-09-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-09-22SenateSecond consideration
2021-09-21SenateFirst consideration
2021-09-21SenateReported as committed
2021-06-16SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2021-06-15SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-1)
2021-06-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-14HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-08HouseRe-committed to RULES
2021-06-08HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-08HouseReported as amended
2021-04-15HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1182
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1182&pn=1238
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1182&pn=1715
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1182P1715.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB1182P1715.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/08/2021&RollCallId=541
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/08/2021&RollCallId=542
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/14/2021&RollCallId=602
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=342
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/15/2021&RollCallId=645
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=09/21/2021&RollCallId=475
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=304
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/29/2021&RollCallId=545

Bill Comments

feedback