PA HB1163 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-22)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of harassment.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-04-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-03-31 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-31 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-03-19 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2013-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-07 | House | First consideration |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |