PA HB113 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for obedience to authorized persons directing traffic and providing for drivers in organized motorcycle processions; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for following too closely.
Title
In general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for obedience to authorized persons directing traffic and providing for drivers in organized motorcycle processions; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for following too closely.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 113 PN 386, FP (Y: 157 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00247 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 113 PN 386, FP (Y: 157 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00247 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-03-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (157-44) |
2021-03-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-17 | House | Second consideration |
2021-03-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-02-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-02-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |