PA HB1099 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-12 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-12 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for the Environmental Quality Board.
Title
In organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for the Environmental Quality Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1099 PN 1755, FP (Y: 160 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1099 PN 1415, 2015 A1643, VITALI (Y: 77 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1099 PN 1415, 2015 A1878, MAHER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1099 PN 1755, FP (Y: 160 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1099 PN 1415, 2015 A1643, VITALI (Y: 77 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1099 PN 1415, 2015 A1878, MAHER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (160-28) |
2015-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-05-13 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-12 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |