PA HB1097 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for CPR instruction.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for CPR instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 4270, FP (Y: 116 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 3743, 2017 A10342, SUSP RULES, MCCARTER (Y: 73 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 3743, 2017 A7827, JAMES (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07650 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 3743, 2017 A10342, SUSP RULES, MCCARTER (Y: 73 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 3743, 2017 A7827, JAMES (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07650 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-31 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (116-71) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |