PA HB1092 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 9, 2008 (P.L.1408, No.113), known as the Scrap Material Theft Prevention Act, further providing for identification requirements for sale of scrap materials to scrap processors and recycling facility operators and for penalties.
Title
Further providing for identification requirements for sale of scrap materials to scrap processors and recycling facility operators and for penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1092 PN 3144, FP (Y: 177 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04203 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1092 PN 3144, FP (Y: 177 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04203 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-09-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (177-23) |
2022-09-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-12 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |