PA HB1091 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for offenses committed with firearms and for sentences for second and subsequent offenses.
Title
In sentencing, further providing for sentences for offenses committed with firearms and for sentences for second and subsequent offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-14 | House | Second consideration |
2015-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-10 | House | First consideration |
2015-12-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |