PA HB1091 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 955 in Lawrence Park Township, Erie County, as the Michael D. Crotty Memorial Parkway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 955 in Lawrence Park Township, Erie County, as the Michael D. Crotty Memorial Parkway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - HB 1091 PN 1188, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-25 - House - HB 1091 PN 1188, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-25 - House - HB 1091 PN 1188, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Senate | Act No. 53 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2011-10-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-10-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2011-10-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-10-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-24 | House | Second consideration |
2011-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2011-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-09-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2011-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |