PA HB109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating Exit 15 of State Route 43, known as the Old Pittsburgh Road interchange, in Fayette County as the Lance Corporal Russell W. Naugle Vietnam Veteran Exit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating Exit 15 of State Route 43, known as the Old Pittsburgh Road interchange, in Fayette County as the Lance Corporal Russell W. Naugle Vietnam Veteran Exit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 109 PN 1679, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00947 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2017-06-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-08HouseReported as amended
2017-01-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=109
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0109&pn=0086
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0109&pn=1679
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/08/2017&RollCallId=341
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/08/2017&RollCallId=340
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=415
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/06/2017&RollCallId=515

Bill Comments

feedback