PA HB1083 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in bonus and tax reports and returns and reports and records relating to tax collections, repealing provisions relating to capital stock and franchise tax reports and payment of tax; in financially distressed municipalities, providing for emergency plan extension, in oil and gas wells, further providing for Oil and Gas Lease Fund; in transportation network companies, motor carrier companies and parking authority of a city of the first class, further providing for transportation network company extension; providing for assessments; in additional special funds and restricted accounts, further providing for establishment of special fund and account, for use of fund and for distributions from Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund; in general budget implementation, further providing for reports to General Assembly, for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, for Department of Health, for State Employees' Retirement System, for surcharges, for Multimodal Transportation Fund and for Liquor Code term; providing for 2020-2021 budget implementation and for 2020-2021 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In bonus and tax reports and returns and reports and records relating to tax collections, repealing provisions relating to capital stock and franchise tax reports and payment of tax; in financially distressed municipalities, providing for emergency plan extension, in oil and gas wells, further providing for Oil and Gas Lease Fund; in transportation network companies, motor carrier companies and parking authority of a city of the first class, further providing for transportation network company extension; providing for assessments; in additional special funds and restricted accounts, further providing for establishment of special fund and account, for use of fund and for distributions from Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund; in general budget implementation, further providing for reports to General Assembly, for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, for Department of Health, for State Employees' Retirement System, for surcharges, for Multimodal Transportation Fund and for Liquor Code term; providing for 2020-2021 budget implementation and for 2020-2021 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1083 PN 3865, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1083 PN 3865, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1083 PN 3865, 2019 A5996, SUSP RULES, VITALI (Y: 92 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1083 PN 3865, VITALI, MOT RECOM RULES (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1083 PN 1256, FP (Y: 188 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29HouseAct No. 23
2020-05-29HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-05-28HousePresented to the Governor
2020-05-28HouseSigned in Senate
2020-05-28HouseSigned in House
2020-05-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (196-6)
2020-05-28HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-05-28HouseReferred to RULES
2020-05-28HouseIn the House
2020-05-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (37-13)
2020-05-28SenateRe-reported as amended
2020-04-07SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-07SenateSecond consideration
2020-04-06SenateFirst consideration
2020-04-06SenateReported as committed
2019-05-03SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-1)
2019-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-17HouseReported as committed
2019-04-08HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1083
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1083&pn=1256
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1083&pn=3865
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=308
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=241
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2019&RollCallId=415
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=04/06/2020&RollCallId=780
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1376
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1377
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1378
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=502
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/28/2020&RollCallId=907
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=05/28/2020&RollCallId=2123

Bill Comments

feedback