PA HB108 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for improper payments; and establishing Do-Not-Pay Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for improper payments; and establishing Do-Not-Pay Initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Floor: HB 108 PN 124, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00027 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-27SenateReported as committed
2021-01-28SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-01-27SenateIn the Senate
2021-01-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-01-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-01-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-01-26HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-13HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-13HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-13HouseReported as amended
2021-01-11HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=108
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0108&pn=0076
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0108&pn=0124
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0108&pn=0076&aYear=2021&an=00027
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0108P0124.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/13/2021&RollCallId=15
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/13/2021&RollCallId=16
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=19
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=92
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=04/27/2021&RollCallId=130

Bill Comments

feedback