PA HB1078 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for the Office for Safe Schools; in high schools, providing for wearing of military uniform at graduation ceremony; and, in State Board of Education, further providing for powers and duties of the board.
Title
Further providing for the Office for Safe Schools; in high schools, providing for wearing of military uniform at graduation ceremony; and, in State Board of Education, further providing for powers and duties of the board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - House - HB 1078 PN 3886, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-29 - House - HB 1078 PN 1182, 2011 A12688, M. SMITH (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - HB 1078 PN 1182, 2011 A12219, ROEBUCK (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - HB 1078 PN 1182, 2011 A11692, DAVIDSON (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-29 - House - HB 1078 PN 1182, 2011 A12688, M. SMITH (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - HB 1078 PN 1182, 2011 A12219, ROEBUCK (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - HB 1078 PN 1182, 2011 A11692, DAVIDSON (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-14 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2012-06-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-06-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2012-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-29 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-12 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |