PA HB1055 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 8, 1868 (P.L.73, No.37), entitled "An act to authorize the recorder of deeds in the several counties of this Commonwealth to record the discharges of all honorably discharged officers and soldiers," further providing for confidentiality of records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of April 8, 1868 (P.L.73, No.37), entitled "An act to authorize the recorder of deeds in the several counties of this Commonwealth to record the discharges of all honorably discharged officers and soldiers," further providing for confidentiality of records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1055 PN 1089, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-12SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-11-10SenateIn the Senate
2021-11-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2021-11-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-11-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-11-09HouseSecond consideration
2021-11-08HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-15HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-15HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-24HouseReported as committed
2021-03-31HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback