PA HB1052 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, further providing for contents of subdivision and land development ordinance.
Title
Further providing for contents of subdivision and land development ordinance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - HB 1052 PN 1830, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - HB 1052 PN 1830, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | House | Act No. 135 |
2014-09-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-09-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-09-23 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-09-22 | House | Signed in House |
2014-09-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (194-4) |
2014-09-22 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-09-16 | House | In the House |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2013-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-15 | House | First consideration |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |