PA HB105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.911, No.147), known as the Telemarketer Registration Act, further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts and penalties and for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts and penalties and for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 105 PN 1573, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 105 PN 604, 2017 A1024, HEFFLEY (Y: 182 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 105 PN 1573, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 105 PN 604, 2017 A1024, HEFFLEY (Y: 182 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-27 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-04-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-18 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |