PA HB1021 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-09-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on April 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-09-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, establishing the Common Cents Program.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, establishing the Common Cents Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-09-24 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-09-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-09-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-20 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-20 | First consideration | |
2007-06-20 | Reported as amended | |
2007-04-05 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1021 |