OR SR201 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates Happy Canyon Indian Pageant and Wild West Show on its centennial anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Happy Canyon Indian Pageant and Wild West Show on its centennial anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Hansell. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Winters. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Taken from 02-05 Calendar and placed on 02-15 Calendar on voice vote. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |