OR SR201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Clatsop Community College as Oregon's Maritime Training College. Designates Clatsop Community College as Oregon's Maritime Training College.
Title
Designating Clatsop Community College as Oregon's Maritime Training College.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Johnson. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |